Aspire Health, Inc. v. Doe I

Plaintiff: Aspire Health, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe I
Case Number: 3:2018cv00906
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 13 SUPPLEMENT filed by Aspire Health, Inc. re #12 Affidavit of Service. (Haltom, James)
October 11, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Google LLC f/k/a Google, Inc. on 10/10/2018, filed by Aspire Health, Inc.. (Haltom, James)
October 10, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (mg)
October 9, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER: It appears that Plaintiff Aspire Health, Inc., has addressed the issues identified by the Court in its denial without prejudice of Aspire's first ex parte motion for expedited discovery (Doc. No. #9 ). Accordingly, for the reasons stated in that order and Aspire's arguments set out below, which the Court finds persuasive, the motion #10 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 9, 2018 10 Second MOTION Ex Parte Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law for Expedited Discovery by Aspire Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Second Declaration of Alan Huffman, #2 Attachment Second Declaration of James Haltom)(Haltom, James)
October 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William W. Drinkwater. (mg)
October 3, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: Aspire's motion for expedited discovery (Doc. No. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling upon a showing that (1) it has attempted to identify the defendant through the proxy registration service; and (2) it has narrowly tailored its request to the identification of John Doe I. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/3/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 2, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drinkwater on behalf of Aspire Health, Inc. (Drinkwater, William)
September 25, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/25/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 24, 2018 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
September 24, 2018 5 Summons issued as to John Doe I. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 24, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Auman Haltom. (mg)
September 24, 2018 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 21, 2018 3 PLAINTIFF ASPIRE HEALTH, INC.'S EX PARTE MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum of Law for Expedited Discovery by Aspire Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of James Haltom, #2 Attachment - Declaration of Alan Huffman, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Discovery)(mg)
September 21, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aspire Health, Inc. (mg)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe I (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2758694), filed by Aspire Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspire Health, Inc. v. Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspire Health, Inc.
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?