Reuther v. Professional Account Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marvin Reuther
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00989
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER: On November 7, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement advising that the parties will submit their dismissal paperwork on or before December 28, 2018. #12 Therefore, the Initial Case Management Conference set for November 29, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/21/18. (gb)
November 7, 2018 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Marvin Reuther (Philipps, David)
November 2, 2018 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Marvin Reuther. Professional Account Services, Inc. served on 10/24/2018. (Philipps, David)
October 10, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion for David J. Phillips and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/10/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 10, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/10/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 3, 2018 8 MOTION for attorney(s) David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2767059) by Marvin Reuther. (Attachments: #1 Attachment IL Certificates in Good Standing, #2 Attachment E.D. Tennessee Certificates in Good Standing)(Lawson, Cynthia)
October 2, 2018 7 Summons issued as to Professional Account Services, Inc. (gb)
October 2, 2018 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/23/2018. (gb)
October 2, 2018 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marvin Reuther. (gb)
October 2, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T. Lawson on behalf of Marvin Reuther. (gb)
October 2, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia T. Lawson. IL State Bar status verified as active for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. (gb)
October 2, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
October 2, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
October 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Professional Account Services, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2766039), filed by Marvin Reuther. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tennessee Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - Tennessee Licensure Information, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Exhibit D - LASPD Representation Letter, #5 Exhibit Group E - Collection Letters, #6 Exhibit F - LASPD Representation Letter, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reuther v. Professional Account Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Reuther
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Cynthia T. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?