Strange v. HealthStream, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Defendant: PHC-Minden G.P., Inc., HealthStream, Inc. and Twilio Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01071
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CORRECTED ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/7/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/4/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
December 3, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Tara L. Swafford and Elizabeth G. Hart. (jm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by HealthStream, Inc.. (Hart, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HealthStream, Inc.. HealthStream, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2018. (Hart, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Hart on behalf of HealthStream, Inc. (Hart, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Twilio Inc. re #21 Notice of Appearance filed by Twilio Inc.. (Dixson, Brigham)
November 26, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of service filed by Twilio Inc. re #20 Notice of Appearance filed by Twilio Inc.. (Miles, Jonathan)
November 26, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #20 and #21 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jm)
November 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin B. Carter and Clarence J. Gideon, Jr. (jm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHC-Minden G.P., Inc. Waiver sent on 11/9/2018. (jm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigham A. Dixson on behalf of Twilio Inc. (Dixson, Brigham)
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Eric Miles on behalf of Twilio Inc. (Miles, Jonathan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by PHC-Minden G.P., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docments from Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Order denyingrequest to proceed in Forma Pauperis)(Carter, Justin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE Conformed Certificate of Service filed by PHC-Minden G.P., Inc. re #11 Notice of Appearance filed by PHC-Minden G.P., Inc.. (Carter, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 RECEIPT #34675052600 in the amount of $100.00 re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 RECEIPT #34675052601 in the amount of $100.00 re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jm)
November 13, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jm)
November 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin B. Carter. (jm)
November 9, 2018 The docket annotation re non-compliance with LR 83.01(b)(2) is DISREGARDED. Entered in error. (jm)
November 9, 2018 (DISREGARD) DOCKET ANNOTATION re: #12 and #14 MOTION(s) for attorney(s) Michael B. Hazzard and Kaytlin L. Roholt to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The motion does not comply with the Court's local rules because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against counsel. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than three (3) business days from the date of entry of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jm) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jm).
November 9, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kaytlin L. Roholt and Michael B. Hazzard: WITHIN 14 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 11/23/2018. (jm)
November 9, 2018 District of Columbia bar status verified as active for Kaytlin L. Roholt and Michael B. Hazzard. (jm) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jm).
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Michael B. Hazzard from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed by Twilio Inc. (jm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee of $100 paid) by Twilio Inc. (jm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Kaytlin L. Roholt from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed by Twilio Inc. (jm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Kaytlin L. Roholt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee of $100 paid) by Twilio Inc. (jm) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jm).
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B. Carter on behalf of PHC-Minden G.P., Inc. (Carter, Justin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Twilio Inc. (af)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Twilio Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(af)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) filed by Twilio Inc. (w/ attached Certificate of Good Standing from the USDC/District of Columbia). (af)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Kaytlin L. Roholt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) filed by Twilio Inc. (w/ attached Certificate of Good Standing from the USDC/District of Columbia) (af)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to the Court to Enter an Order Directing Defendants to Preserve Documents, and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order) (jm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to The Court That 'Waiver of Summons Packets' Have Been Mailed to the Defendants' Registered Agents filed by Clinton Strange. (jm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Clinton Strange re enclosed documents. (jm)
October 15, 2018 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case. (Docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Clinton Strange. (jm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Supporting Documents)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. HealthStream, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHC-Minden G.P., Inc.
Represented By: Clarence J. Gideon, Jr.
Represented By: Justin B. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthStream, Inc.
Represented By: Tara L. Swafford
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twilio Inc.
Represented By: Kaytlin L. Roholt
Represented By: Michael B. Hazzard
Represented By: Brigham A. Dixson
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?