GRE, LLC v. United States of America

Plaintiff: GRE, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01119
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Amendment of Order filed by GRE, LLC (Docket No. #17 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall docket the filings in this civil case within the docket of United States v. Bart Sidney Posey, Criminal Case No. 3:13-cr-119, as GRE, LLC's filing is a Petition for Ancillary Proceeding related to the Posey criminal case. It was opened as a separate civil case in error by the Clerk. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/10/2018. (mg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss and for Amendment of Order by GRE, LLC. (Roberts, S.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/20/18. (gb)
November 19, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips. (gb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Memorandum in Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Advertisement & Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notices of Judicial Forfeiture)(Phillips, Debra)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss CIVIL ACTION AND REMOVE PETITION TO THE FORFEITURE ANCILLARY HEARING IN THE CRIMINAL CASE AND RESPONSE TO CIVIL SUMMONS by United States of America. (Phillips, Debra)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Teufel Phillips on behalf of United States of America (Phillips, Debra)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: I hereby recuse myself in the above-styled action. This case shall be returned to the Clerk for reassignment of another magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/22/18. (gb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger, it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the magistrate judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before the magistrate judge ( #4 ) is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/18. (gb)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: After consultation with Judge Trauger, this action is TRANSFERRED to Judge Trauger as a related case to Case No. 3:13-cr-00119, USA v. Bart Sidney Posey, Sr. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/18/18. (gb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (gb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
October 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lauren Paxton Roberts and S. Madison Roberts, IV. (gb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR ANCILLARY PROCEEDINGS TO ESTABLISH THIRD PARTY RIGHT TO PROPERTY IN CRIMINAL FORFEITURE ACTION against United States of America (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2775541), filed by GRE, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture, #2 Exhibit Deed to Posey, #3 Exhibit Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit Index of Lis Pendens, #5 Exhibit Decree Confirming Sale, #6 Exhibit Agreed Order, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRE, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRE, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: S. Madison Roberts, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?