Renovales v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC

Plaintiff: Magaly Renovales
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01122
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has notified the Magistrate Judge's chambers that this matter has settled. By January 14, 2019, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other closing document. Accordingly, the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for December 17, 2018, is hereby CANCELED. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to the District Judge for his consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/31/2018. (am)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 Summons issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC. (Attorney David J. Philipps sent service packets by regular mail.) (am) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/18/2018) (am). Modified Date on 10/18/2018 (am).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney(s) David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2776621) by Magaly Renovales. (Attachments: #1 Attachment E.D. TN Letters of Good Standing)(Philipps, David)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/7/2018. (am)
October 17, 2018 TN & IL State Bar status verified as active for David J. Philipps, Mary E. Philipps. (am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Magaly Renovales. (am)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T. Lawson on behalf of Magaly Renovales (am)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Credit Adjusters, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2776031), filed by Magaly Renovales. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Tennessee Secretary of State Corporate Information, #3 Exhibit B - Tennessee Licensure Information, #4 Exhibit C - LACD July 12, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Agreed Payment Plan, #6 Exhibit E - Collection Letters)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renovales v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly Renovales
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: Cynthia T. Lawson
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?