United States of America v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., PRLAP, INC., Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee and Josie Holt-Burns
Case Number: 3:2018cv01143
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Service filed by United States of America re #13 Green Card Returned filed by United States of America, Docket Annotation, #12 Certificate of Service filed by United States of America, #14 Green Card Returned filed by United States of America, #15 Notice (Other) filed by United States of America. (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/12/2018 (am).
December 11, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #15 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (am)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States of America re #13 Green Card Returned, #12 Certificate of Service, #14 Green Card Returned Notice of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 7, 2018 (Chase, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed PRLAP, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Bank of America, N.A Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 Acceptance of Service by Mail - Josie Holt-Burns by United States of America (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/11/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Fisher, Jr. (am)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Fisher, Jr on behalf of Josie Holt-Burns (Fisher, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $1,175.00. Receipt Number 3467505401. (sw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Chase, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Chase, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $1,175 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel designate the name and address of the individual, or individuals, who are to receive the monies in the order of disbursement of funds. Social Security numbers shall not be included in documents to be filed but shall be provided to the Clerk's Office upon request. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/23/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 19, 2018 District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr added. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case due to conflict issue. (af)
October 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description)(am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Map, #2 Attachment - Property Description, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Bank of America, N.A., Josie Holt-Burns, PRLAP, INC., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Property Description)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLAP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josie Holt-Burns
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?