Bell v. McLemore
Appellee: John C. McLemore
Interested Party: Matt Loughney and Dawn Miller
Appellant: Owen Carl Bell
Case Number: 3:2018cv01173
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/25/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/23/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BAP. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-bk-02966; 17-ap-90040. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USBC Order 1, #2 Attachment USBC Order 2, #3 Attachment Opt Out Statement of Appellee, #4 Attachment BAP Docket Sheet, #5 Attachment USBC Docket Sheet, #6 Attachment BAP Transfer Order)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John C. McLemore
Represented By: William J. Harbison, II
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Represented By: Marc T. McNamee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Matt Loughney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dawn Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Owen Carl Bell
Represented By: Mark T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?