United States of America v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Raymond Hopkins, Mary Lou Hopkins and Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2018cv01222
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Fisher, Jr. (am)
December 21, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Fisher, Jr on behalf of Mary Lou Hopkins, Raymond Hopkins (Fisher, James)
December 21, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mary Lou Hopkins, Raymond Hopkins.(Fisher, James)
December 11, 2018 13 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America re #12 Certificate of Service, #11 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 7, 2018 (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY MAIL by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Mary Lou Hopkins (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/12/2018 (am).
December 11, 2018 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY MAIL by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Raymond Hopkins (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/12/2018 (am).
November 27, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion For Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession. Accordingly, Plaintiff TVA shall have and be put into immediate possession of the real property specifically described in Plaintiff's Declaration of Taking to the extent necessary to allow, enable, and permit TVA to carry on and perform any of its operations described in the pleadings. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 15, 2018 9 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $1,900.00. Receipt Number 34675052576. (sw)
November 9, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION For Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
November 9, 2018 7 MOTION For Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
November 9, 2018 6 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 7, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $1,900 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that counsel presenting this order serve a copy thereof on the Clerk of this Court or his Chief Deputy. Absent the aforesaid service, the Clerk is hereby relieved of personal liability relative to compliance with this order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/7/2018. (xc: Copy sent to financial via ecf.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 1, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (am)
November 1, 2018 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 1, 2018 3 NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description)(am)
November 1, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Map, #2 Attachment - Property Description)(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: #3 Attachment - Order Directing Deposit of Funds) (am).
November 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Mary Lou Hopkins, Raymond Hopkins, filed by United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Property Description)(am) Modified Text on 11/2/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Hopkins
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Hopkins
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?