Hicks v. Robertson County Election Commission

Plaintiff: Lori Hicks
Defendant: Robertson County Election Commission
Case Number: 3:2018cv01235
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for January 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. with the undersigned is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/3/2019. (dt)
January 3, 2019 8 NOTICE of Filing by Lori Hicks Consent Permanent Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Permanent Injunction Order)(Gastel, Benjamin)
January 3, 2019 7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference Indefinitely by Lori Hicks. (Gastel, Benjamin)
November 15, 2018 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Lori Hicks. Robertson County Election Commission served on 11/14/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin)
November 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (af)
November 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anthony A. Orlandi, Benjamin A. Gastel, & James Gerard Stranch, IV. (af)
November 5, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Robertson County Election Commission and placed at intake for pickup by counsel. (af)
November 5, 2018 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lori Hicks. (af)
November 5, 2018 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lori Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(af)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lori Hicks against Robertson County Election Commission (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2791076). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Robertson County Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hicks
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson County Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?