Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01264
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan David Stewart. (dt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clinton H. Scott (Scott, Clinton)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc.. (Scott, Clinton)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Stewart on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Stewart, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/26/2018. (dt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of service filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Reviere, Russell)
December 13, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #8 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
December 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell E. Reviere. (dt)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Reviere, Russell)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc.. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2. Certified Mail Return Receipt)(McWherter, J.)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/16/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
November 8, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter, Jonathan L. Bobbitt and Clinton H. Scott. (dt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (dt).
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2794327), filed by Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan David Stewart
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Crossings Townhomes Owner Associations, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?