Haas v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Craig Haas
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01278
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Alistair Newbern
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Erin Palmer Polly. (jw)
December 21, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Polly, Erin)
December 21, 2018 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Polly, Erin)
December 21, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Polly, Erin)
December 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher Michael Bellamy. (jw)
December 17, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Bellamy on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bellamy, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 13, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
November 13, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
November 13, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
November 13, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
November 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Susan S. Lafferty. (jw)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2795448), filed by Craig Haas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haas v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Haas
Represented By: Susan S. Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?