CenturyLink Communications, Inc. v. Hot Wheels Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CenturyLink Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Kaydyn Directional Drilling, Inc. and Hot Wheels Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01280
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by CenturyLink Communications, Inc.. (Shumate, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc.. Hot Wheels Services, Inc. served on 12/7/2018. (Shumate, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew N. Grams and John Roy Tarpley. (jm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Grams on behalf of Hot Wheels Services, Inc. (Grams, Andrew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc.. Kaydyn Directional Drilling, Inc. served on 12/13/2018. (Shumate, Thomas)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: By Order entered November 28, 2018 (Docket No. #12 ), this action was referred to the undersigned as the case manager. The Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled for January 17, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 783, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/29/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on January 17, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for James J. Proszek and Katie N. Wagner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/16/2018. (jm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 01:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Hot Wheels Services, Inc. and Kaydyn Directional Drilling, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Katie N. Wagner from the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma filed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc.. (Shumate, Thomas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney James J. Proszek from the United States District Court for the Western of Oklahoma filed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc.. (Shumate, Thomas)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney(s) James J. Proszek; Katie N. Wagner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2799194) by CenturyLink Communications, Inc. (DISREGARD ATTACHMENTS) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, Proszek, # 2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, Wagner)(Shumate, Thomas) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jm).
November 15, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL James J. Proszek and Katie N. Wagner: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/6/2018. (jm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc. (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Attachment FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jm).
November 15, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas W. Shumate, IV. OK State Bar status verified as active for James J. Proszek and Katie N. Wagner. (jm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hot Wheels Services, Inc. and Kaydyn Directional Drilling, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2798764), filed by CenturyLink Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CenturyLink Communications, Inc. v. Hot Wheels Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaydyn Directional Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Wheels Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew N. Grams
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CenturyLink Communications, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Proszek
Represented By: Katie N. Wagner
Represented By: Thomas W. Shumate, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?