United States of America v. Kestner et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael Kestner, Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Lisabeth Smolenski Williams, Pain MD, LLC, Mid-South Pain Management, P.C., Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C., Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C., Rock Island Medical Group, P.C., Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C. and MedManagement, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01289
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This Court's Second Supplemental Administrative Order No. 82 suspends all civil litigation in which the United States is a party until the earlier of February 10, 2019, or such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. The initial case management conference in this matter currently set for January 14, 2019, is therefore CONTINUED. The parties shall file a joint motion to reset the conference within seven days of the funding of the government or the expiration of the Court's administrative order and any future extension thereof, whichever occurs first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on January 11, 2019. (AN)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by United States of America. (McIntyre, Ellen)
January 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kimberly G. Silvus, Brooke McLeod Coplon and Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III. (gb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III on behalf of Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C., Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Mid-South Pain Management, P.C., Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C., Rock Island Medical Group, P.C., Lisabeth Smolenski Williams (Wiseman, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke McLeod Coplon on behalf of Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C., Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Mid-South Pain Management, P.C., Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C., Rock Island Medical Group, P.C., Lisabeth Smolenski Williams (Coplon, Brooke)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly G. Silvus on behalf of Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C., Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Mid-South Pain Management, P.C., Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C., Rock Island Medical Group, P.C., Lisabeth Smolenski Williams (Silvus, Kimberly)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Rock Island Medical Group, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Mid-South Pain Management, P.C. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Lisabeth Smolenski Williams waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McIntyre, Ellen)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/20/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C., Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C., Michael Kestner, Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C., MedManagement, Inc., Mid-South Pain Management, P.C., Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C., Pain MD, LLC, Rock Island Medical Group, P.C., Lisabeth Smolenski Williams, filed by United States of America. Service copies not provided. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Representative False Claims, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kestner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebanon Back Pain Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisabeth Smolenski Williams
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain MD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Pain Management, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mountain Medical Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Bridge Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Island Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Back Pain Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Kimberly G. Silvus
Represented By: Brooke McLeod Coplon
Represented By: Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedManagement, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ellen Bowden McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?