Popple v. United States of America
Petitioner: Marshall A. Popple
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01300
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jerry Gonzalez. (jm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition by Marshall A. Popple. (Gonzalez, Jerry)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUBPOENAS AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court APPOINTS the Federal Public Defender to represent Petitioner. On or before January 14, 2019, appointed counsel shall file an amended petition on behalf of Petitioner. On or before February 28, 2019, Respondent shall file a response to the amended petition in accordance with Rule 5 of the 2255 Rules. On or before March 14, 2019, Petitioner may file an optional reply in accordance with Rule 5(d) of the 2255 Rules. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/28/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Van S. Vincent on behalf of United States of America (Vincent, Van)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself in this matter. Any court dates and deadlines shall remain in effect pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/21/2018. (xc: Updated docket sheet and order sent to Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm) Modified on 11/21/2018 (jm).
November 20, 2018 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
November 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent Adams Hannafan. (afs)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Marshall A. Popple.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popple v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marshall A. Popple
Represented By: Henry Alan Martin
Represented By: Jerry Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Van S. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?