Parde et al v. Magazines.com, LLC

Plaintiff: Laura Parde, Rachel DeLaguila and Jerome Williams
Defendant: Magazines.com, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01307
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Alistair Newbern
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #11 ) of William Craft Hughes is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/19/2018. (mg)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #10 ) of John William Frazee is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/19/2018. (mg)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #9 ) of Jarrett Ellzey is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/19/2018. (mg)
December 14, 2018 TX State Bar status verified as active for Jarrett L. Ellzey, W. Craft Hughes and John William Frazee. (mg)
December 13, 2018 11 MOTION for attorney(s) William Craft Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815291) by Rachel DeLaguila, Laura Parde, Jerome Williams. (Johnson, Michael)
December 13, 2018 10 MOTION for attorney(s) John William Frazee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815287) by Rachel DeLaguila, Laura Parde, Jerome Williams. (Johnson, Michael)
December 13, 2018 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Jarrett Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815219) by Rachel DeLaguila, Laura Parde, Jerome Williams. (Johnson, Michael) Modified text on 12/13/2018 (mg).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 26, 2018 7 Summons issued as to Magazines.com, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
November 26, 2018 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jarrett L. Ellzey, and W. Craft Hughes: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/17/2018. (mg)
November 26, 2018 TX State Bar status verified as active for Jarrett L. Ellzey, and W. Craft Hughes. (mg)
November 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael A. Johnson, and John J. Griffin, Jr. (mg)
November 26, 2018 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 21, 2018 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Laura Parde. (af)
November 21, 2018 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rachel DeLaguila. (af)
November 21, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jerome Williams. (af)
November 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rachel DeLaguila, Jerome Williams, Laura Parde against Magazines.com, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2802767). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parde et al v. Magazines.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magazines.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Parde
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Represented By: Jarrett L. Ellzey
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Represented By: John William Frazee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel DeLaguila
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Represented By: Jarrett L. Ellzey
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Williams
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Represented By: Jarrett L. Ellzey
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?