Kitts v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Richard Kitts
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and North American Stamping Group
Case Number: 3:2018cv01334
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RESETTING: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/4/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America and North American Stamping Group. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt)
December 3, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for K. Cody Allison, Samuel D. Payne and Lauren W. Travis. (dt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America and North American Stamping Group (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2808059), filed by Richard Kitts. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 12/3/2018 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitts v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kitts
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Stamping Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?