Sands v. Fan Fest News, LLC

Plaintiff: Steve Sands
Defendant: Fan Fest News, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01353
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/18/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 10, 2018 TN & NY State Bar status verified as active for James R. Wiggington, Richard Liebowitz. (am)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Fan Fest News, LLC. (Service packets to be picked up at the front counter.) (am)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/28/2018. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wiggington on behalf of Steve Sands (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fan Fest News, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2811629), filed by Steve Sands. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Infringed Work, #3 Exhibit B - Registration of Copyright, #4 Exhibit C - Infringing Work)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sands v. Fan Fest News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sands
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fan Fest News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?