Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC v. Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC
Defendant: Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC and Margaret Karcher LeVecke
Case Number: 3:2018cv01357
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to continue the February 4, 2019, initial case management conference filed January 29, 2019, Docket Entry No. #19 . The Court will GRANT the continuance, and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from February 4, 2019, to 1:30 p.m, March 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Mantooth, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC served on 12/13/2018. (Mantooth, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. Margaret Karcher LeVecke served on 12/21/2018. (Mantooth, David)
January 29, 2019 Notice to Filer re DE 15, 16: The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the documents. (mg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 ***DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge; Complaint with Exhibits; Business Entity Disclosure; Notice Regarding Business Entity Disclosure Statement; Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Notice Regarding Consent of the Parties; Order; Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference; and Declaration of Brian Cassidy with Exhibits. served on Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC c/o CT Corporation System (Registered Agent) on 12/13/2018, filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Mantooth, David) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (mg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 ***DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge; Complaint with Exhibits; Business Entity Disclosure; Notice Regarding Business Entity Disclosure Statement; Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Notice Regarding Consent of the Parties; Order; Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference; and Declaration of Brian Cassidy with Exhibits. served on Margaret Karcher LeVecke on 12/21/2018, filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Mantooth, David) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #12 ) of James C. Rubinger is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 1/9/2019. (mg) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #11 ) of Benjamin B. Reed is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 1/9/2019. (mg) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 VA State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin B. Reed and James C. Rubinger. (mg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney(s) James C. Rubinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2823261) by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of James C. Rubinger, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Good Standing, James C. Rubinger)(Mantooth, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Benjamin B. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2823212) by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Benjamin B. Reed, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Good Standing, Benjamin B. Reed)(Mantooth, David)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/12/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Brian Cassidy filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Franchise Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit 4-Termination Notice, #5 Exhibit 5-Expiration of Temporary License Notice)(Mantooth, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC . (Mantooth, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Mantooth, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Margaret Karcher LeVecke, and Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
December 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Randall Mantooth, and Michael S. Holder. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Margaret Karcher LeVecke, Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2812073), filed by Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Franchise Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit 4 - Termination Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Expiration of Temporary License Notice, #6 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC v. Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Holder
Represented By: David Randall Mantooth
Represented By: James C. Rubinger
Represented By: Benjamin B. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Karcher LeVecke Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Karcher LeVecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?