Breedlove v. Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The et al
Plaintiff: Nakisha Breedlove
Defendant: Jane Doe, Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The, John Doe, Legends Hospitality, LLC, Cumberland Stadium, Inc. and Tennessee Football, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01393
Filed: December 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The, Tennessee Football, Inc. (Summons issued at the front counter and given to attorney) (am)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Legends Hospitality, LLC served on 2/4/2019. (Burton, Randall) Modified Text on 2/19/2019 (am).
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed Cumberland Stadium, Inc served on 2/4/2019. (Burton, Randall) Modified Text on 2/19/2019 (am).
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Cumberland Stadium, Inc., Jane Doe, John Doe, Legends Hospitality, LLC, Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
December 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Randall W. Burton. (am)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
December 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cumberland Stadium, Inc., Jane Doe, John Doe, Legends Hospitality, LLC, The Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County and Tennessee Football, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2821452), filed by Nakisha Breedlove. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breedlove v. Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Authority of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legends Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Stadium, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakisha Breedlove
Represented By: Randall W. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?