Samuels v. Medicredit, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mieccia Samuels
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00008
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Medicredit, Inc.. (Caldwell, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The #17 Motion for Plaintiff's out-of-town counsel to appear telephonically at the upcoming initial case management conference is GRANTED if Plaintiff's local counsel appears at the initial case management conference in person, is prepared to discuss the case in full, and has scheduling authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/27/2019. (jw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically (unopposed) by Mieccia Samuels. (Kerney, Frank)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Jamie N. Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 2/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Annotation - Deficiency Notice, #14 MOTION for attorney Jamie N. Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2856886) To Supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Medicredit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement Under Oath by Jamie Cotter)(Longmire, Wendy) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jw).
February 21, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jw)
February 21, 2019 CO State Bar status verified as active for Jamie N. Cotter. (jw)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Jamie N. Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2856886) by Medicredit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Longmire, Wendy)
February 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas William A. Caldwell and Wendy Lynne Longmire. (jw)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Medicredit, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Longmire, Wendy)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medicredit, Inc..(Longmire, Wendy)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Lynne Longmire on behalf of Medicredit, Inc. (Longmire, Wendy)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William A. Caldwell on behalf of Medicredit, Inc. (Caldwell, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on March 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) Modified on 1/15/2019 (jw).
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Mieccia Samuels. Medicredit, Inc. served on 1/10/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Medicredit, Inc. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
January 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Frank H. Kerney, III and Zachary D. Wiley. (jw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medicredit, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2826508), filed by Mieccia Samuels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuels v. Medicredit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Lynne Longmire
Represented By: Thomas William A. Caldwell
Represented By: Jamie N. Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mieccia Samuels
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Represented By: Zachary D. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?