Imagen, Inc. v. Design and Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Imagen, Inc.
Defendant: Design and Production, Inc. and Hartford Fire Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Imagen, Inc. (Herron, Roy)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The District Judge is provided notice that on February 19, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss with supporting documents ( #17 ). All previously imposed deadlines remain in effect absent further order of the Court, including the initial case management conference date of April 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Imagen, Inc. (Herron, Roy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Design and Production, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (Perutelli, Barbara)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Design and Production, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-Subcontract)(Perutelli, Barbara)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Imagen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Prime Contract)(Herron, Roy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Imagen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email from Jay Barnwell to Joan LaGrasse, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract Bond, #3 Exhibit Collective Exhibit C - Notice of Nonpayment with Attachments)(Herron, Roy)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. The initial case management conference will proceed whether or not a ruling has entered on the pending dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss by Barbara J. Perutelli on behalf of All Defendants (Perutelli, Barbara)
January 23, 2019 Note to Filer re DE#11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all counsel of record on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (gb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by All Defendants. (Perutelli, Barbara)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss by Design and Production, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-Subcontract, #3 Exhibit 2-Correspondence & Invoice)(Perutelli, Barbara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Design and Production, Inc. (Perutelli, Barbara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Organizational List)(Perutelli, Barbara)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. The Initial Case Management Conference set by Judge Trauger for March 11, 2019, is CANCELLED, to be reset by Magistrate Judge Holmes. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/11/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/9/19. (gb)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice ( #5 ) of Edward J. Tolchin is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court, on 1/9/19. (gb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney(s) Edward J. Tolchin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2827376) by Design and Production, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Perutelli, Barbara)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nancy C. Miller-Herron: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 1/28/2019. (gb)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward J. Tolchin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/28/2019. (gb)
January 7, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Barbara J. Perutelli, Keene Woodbridge Bartley, Roy B. Herron and Nancy C. Miller-Herron. MD State Bar status verified as active for Edward J. Tolchin. (gb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Design and Production, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Co. from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18-1395-III. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2826510) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service of Process and Complaint, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imagen, Inc. v. Design and Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design and Production, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara J. Perutelli
Represented By: Edward J. Tolchin
Represented By: Keene Woodbridge Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Co.
Represented By: Barbara J. Perutelli
Represented By: Edward J. Tolchin
Represented By: Keene Woodbridge Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imagen, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy C. Miller-Herron
Represented By: Roy B. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?