Phillips v. Tyler

Plaintiff: Charlie Phillips
Defendant: Marvin Benet Tyler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Motion #8 granted to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to April 11, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/8/2019. (mg) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Charlie Phillips. (Campbell, Karla)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Charlie Phillips. Marvin Benet Tyler served on 1/31/2019. (Campbell, Karla)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/18/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Marvin Benet Tyler. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
January 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Karla M. Campbell. (mg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marvin Benet Tyler (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2831866), filed by Charlie Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Benet Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Phillips
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?