Rubin Lublin TN PLLC v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Rubin Lublin TN PLLC
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service and Ronnie Dale Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR INTERPLEADER AND DISBURSING FUNDS: The United States' Motion For Order Granting Petition For Interpleader And Disbursing Funds be and hereby is GRANTED. This interpleader action is DISMISSED, with each party to bear its own costs, including attorney's fees. The Initial Case Management Conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern set at 9:30 a.m. on March 18, 2019 (Doc. # 4) is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) United States' Motion For Order Granting Petition For Interpleader And Disbursing Funds by United States of America Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order Granting Petition For Interpleader And Disbursing Funds)(Martineau, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #9 ) of Michael J. Martineau is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 2/6/2019. (jm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Michael J. Martineau to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by United States of America Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Martineau, Michael) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jm).
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rubin Lublin TN PLLC. (Chaness, Bret)
January 30, 2019 Notice to Filer re DE #7 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jm)
January 30, 2019 Notice to filer re DE #7 : Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/" or inserted facsimile signature. Counsel shall re- file the document. (jm)
January 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Bret J. Chaness. (jm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rubin Lublin TN PLLC. (Chaness, Bret)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bret J. Chaness on behalf of Rubin Lublin TN PLLC (Chaness, Bret)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 22, 2019 The Notice to Counsel sent to Michael J. Martineau regarding the PHV requirement is stayed until the Government shutdown ends. (af)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tenise A. Cook: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 2/6/2019. (jm)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael J. Martineau: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted (LR 83.01(b)). Fee of $100 is waived. PHV due by 2/6/2019. (jm)
January 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter L. Lublin, Tenise A. Cook, and Patricia Lynn Whitehead; District of Columbia Bar status verified as active for Michael J. Martineau. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America Internal Revenue Service from Chancery Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18-1131-I. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Filings) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubin Lublin TN PLLC v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael J. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Dale Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubin Lublin TN PLLC
Represented By: Patricia Lynn Whitehead
Represented By: Tenise A. Cook
Represented By: Peter L. Lublin
Represented By: Bret J. Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?