Grange Insurance Company v. Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Defendant: Gary Wisniewski, Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc. and Frank Betz Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00081
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jm)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pending in this matter is the parties' Joint Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Extend Answer Deadline (Docket Entry #17 ). The motion is GRANTED. The defendants are granted up to and including June 3, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset for 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, June 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/27/2019. (jm)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #10 ) of Meliah B. Jefferson is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 2/26/2019. (jm) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (jm).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #9 ) of Wallace K. Lightsey is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 2/26/2019. (jm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Extend Answer Deadline by Grange Insurance Company. (Vescovo, Nicholas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT filed by Frank Betz Associates, Inc. re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Telfeyan, Kelly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT filed by Frank Betz Associates, Inc. re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Telfeyan, Kelly)
February 14, 2019 The pending pro hac vice motions (Docket Nos. #9 and #10 ) do not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jm)
February 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kelly M. Telfeyan, Richard Slade Sevier, Jr., Stephen J. Zralek, and Samuel L. Jackson; SC State Bar status verified as active for Wallace K. Lightsey and Meliah Bowers Jefferson. (jm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L. Jackson on behalf of Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc., Gary Wisniewski (Jackson, Samuel)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Zralek on behalf of Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc., Gary Wisniewski (Zralek, Stephen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Frank Betz Associates, Inc.. (Telfeyan, Kelly)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Frank Betz Associates, Inc..(Telfeyan, Kelly)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Meliah B Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2851501) by Frank Betz Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Meliah Jefferson)(Telfeyan, Kelly) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (jm).
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Wallace K. Lightsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2851481) by Frank Betz Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Wallace Lightsey)(Telfeyan, Kelly)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of RESETTING of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jm) (jm).
January 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Joe Brown added. Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern no longer assigned to case per order at DE 7. (af)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown as related to Case No. 3:17-cv-00786. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on January 22, 2019. (AN)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/18/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Frank Betz Associates, Inc., Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc., and Gary Wisniewski. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
January 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lucas A. Davidson and Nicholas L. Vescovo. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank Betz Associates, Inc., Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc., and Gary Wisniewski (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2833149), filed by Grange Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Original Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Email, #6 Exhibit E - RoR Letters, #7 Exhibit F - 09-10 Policy, #8 Exhibit G (Part 1) - 16-17 Policy (ISO 04-13), #9 Exhibit G (Part 2) - 16-17 Policy (ISO 04-13), #10 Exhibit H - Wayback Machine Images, #11 Exhibit I - Grange Umbrella Policy)(jm) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/17/2019) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Insurance Company v. Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wisniewski
Represented By: Samuel L. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Homes of Tennessee Inc.
Represented By: Samuel L. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Betz Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Kelly M. Telfeyan
Represented By: Richard Slade Sevier, Jr.
Represented By: Wallace K. Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas L. Vescovo
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?