Schreiner v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Schreiner
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00094
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Reset Initial Case Management Conference by United Behavioral Health, Inc. and United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Fulks, Mark) Modified on 3/15/2019 (dt).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on any party who has not entered an appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Response Deadlines. Docket No. #15 . This Motion is GRANTED in part. The deadline for a Response to the Complaint is March 19, 2019, the same date as the Initial Case Management Conference. The parties are put on notice that, pursuant to Judge Crenshaws February 6, 2019, Order, the briefing schedule on the preliminary injunction motion will be set at the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/12/19. (dt) Modified on 2/13/2019 (dt).
February 11, 2019 Notice to Filer re DE #15 : The document is scanned and not text searchable. Scanning should only be used for documents not created on your computer. This document does not need to be re-filed unless otherwise directed by the Court. (dt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Fulks, Mark) Modified on 2/12/2019 (dt).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Doc. No. #6 .) As soon as possible, the parties shall discuss with the Magistrate Judge the extent of the limited discovery necessary to prepare for a hearing on the Motion. With the Magistrate Judge's approval, the parties shall set an agreed-upon briefing schedule so that the motion is briefed after the limited discovery is completed, and shall provide the Court with multiple available preliminary injunction hearing dates from May to August of 2019. The parties should also estimate the length of the hearing. The parties are further advised that the Court requires the parties to depose any witness that will testify at the hearing at least seven days prior to the hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Stephanie Schreiner. United Behavioral Health, Inc. served on 1/30/2019. (Pepper, J.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Stephanie Schreiner. United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 1/23/2019. (Pepper, J.)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/23/19. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
January 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Ross Pepper, Jr and Matthew E. Pulle. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to United Behavioral Health, Inc. and United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.)(dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Stephanie Schreiner filed by Stephanie Schreiner re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Memorandum in Support. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Rachael Wacker filed by Stephanie Schreiner re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Memorandum in Support. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Diana Chu, MD filed by Stephanie Schreiner re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Memorandum in Support. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephanie Schreiner. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stephanie Schreiner. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2836112), filed by Stephanie Schreiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate Of Coverage, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. Haney's Psychological Eval, Redacted, #4 Exhibit D - ERTP Discharge Summary, Redacted, #5 Exhibit E - DCS Safety Plan, Redacted, #6 Exhibit F - Wacker's Diagnostic Assessment, Redacted, #7 Exhibit G - Dr. Chu psychiatric note 10-24-2018, Redacted, #8 Exhibit H - Dr. Chu psychiatric note 11-7-18, Redacted, #9 Exhibit I - Glassford's PscyhosexualAssessment, Redacted, #10 Exhibit J - Family Collaborative initial meeting (Wacker)11.15.18, Redacted, #11 Exhibit K - Dr. Chu psychiatric note 11-16-18, Redacted, #12 Exhibit L - United's Initial Denial letter, Redacted, #13 Exhibit M - Appeal Denial Letter, Redacted, #14 Exhibit N - DCS petition Dec 4th 2018, Redacted, #15 Exhibit O - Kayla Holt Affidavit, Redacted, #16 Exhibit P - Schreiner Declaration - Dec. 31, 2018, Redacted, #17 Exhibit Q - Chu & Wacker Declarations from Second-Level Appeal, Redacted, #18 Exhibit R - Second-Level Appeal Denial Letter, Redacted, #19 Exhibit S - Dr. Chu Jan. 4, 2019 Letter, Redacted, #20 Exhibit T - UBH Level of Care Guidelines, #21 Exhibit U - United HealthCare's Continuing Stay Criteria, #22 Exhibit V - Williamson Co. Admin. Review Order, Redacted, #23 Exhibit W - Mille Lacs Discharge Summary, Redacted, #24 Exhibit X - TIMELINE OF CRITICAL EVENTS, Redacted, #25 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schreiner v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Schreiner
Represented By: Matthew E. Pulle
Represented By: J. Ross Pepper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark A. Fulks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Fulks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?