Shannon v. 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LeAnn Shannon
Defendant: Flournoy Construction Company, LLC and 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC. (Swafford, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC.(Swafford, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flournoy Construction Company, LLC. (Leathers, H.)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flournoy Construction Company, LLC.(Leathers, H.)
March 13, 2019 VA State Bar status verified as active for Joshua C. Cumby. (dt)
March 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Cumby on behalf of 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC (Cumby, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Flournoy Construction Company, LLC answer due 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/5/2019. (jw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Consent Motion). (Leathers, H.) Modified on 2/28/2019 (dt).
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Consent Motion) by Flournoy Construction Company, LLC. (Leathers, H.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC answer due 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas Anthony Swafford. (dt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond by 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Swafford, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on any party who has not entered an appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/20/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Eric G. Calhoun to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/28/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT filed by LeAnn Shannon re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - California State Bar Letter)(Calhoun, Eric)
January 25, 2019 NOTE TO FILER: The pending pro hac vice motion (Docket No. #6 ) does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (dt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Eric G. Calhoun to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2838584) by LeAnn Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Todd, Henry)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Eric G. Calhoun: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/12/2019. (dt)
January 22, 2019 TX State Bar status verified as active for Eric G. Calhoun. TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry Franklin Todd, Jr. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC and Flournoy Construction Company, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC and Flournoy Construction Company, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2836155), filed by LeAnn Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flournoy Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: H. Rowan Leathers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2401 Lakeshore EAT, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Swafford
Represented By: Joshua C. Cumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeAnn Shannon
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Henry Franklin Todd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?