Burley v. Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force
Plaintiff: Ivan Antjuan Burley
Defendant: Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force, Officer Jason Arnold, Sumner County and Judge Dee David Gay
Case Number: 3:2019cv00118
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Herbert H. Slatery III, Attorney General for the State of Tennessee. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Attorney General of the State of Tennessee for not including the name of the Attorney General. (jw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Arnold, Dee David Gay, Sumner County, Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force, filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Ivan Burley's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to ISSUE PROCESS to the defendant Drug Task Force, to the attention of Director Kelly Murphy, at the address provided by Plaintiff, and to ensure service upon Defendant, the Tennessee Attorney General, and Anthony Holt, Sumner County Executive, at 355 North Belvedere Drive, Room 102, Gallatin, TN 37066. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 6, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (jw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ivan Antjuan Burley. (jw) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jw).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burley v. Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Antjuan Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jason Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Dee David Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?