Person v. Emmanuel et al

Plaintiff: Kim Person
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20 Does
Counter Plaintiff: Tommy Emmanuel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Kim Person. (Miller, Samuel)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Kim Person.(Van Dyke James, A.)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Kim Person by Tommy Emmanuel.(Warnock, Timothy)
March 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock and David Andrew Curtis. (jm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Curtis on behalf of Tommy Emmanuel (Curtis, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Warnock on behalf of Tommy Emmanuel (Warnock, Timothy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Kim Person. Tommy Emmanuel served on 2/22/2019. (Miller, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 2/13/2019 (jm).
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Tommy Emmanuel. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
February 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel F. Miller, Nicholas R. Valenti, and A. Grace Van Dyke James. (jm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does 1-20 Does and Tommy Emmanuel (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2850277), filed by Kim Person. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Residency, #3 Exhibit 2 - Album Cover Credits, #4 Exhibit 3 - March 14 Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - March 29 Letter) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Person v. Emmanuel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Person
Represented By: Nicholas R. Valenti
Represented By: A. Grace Van Dyke James
Represented By: Samuel F. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Tommy Emmanuel
Represented By: David Andrew Curtis
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?