Christian v. Reynolds-Christian et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Christian
Defendant: Kirsten Cromie, Donna Davenport, Arlene Middaugh, Amani Loggins, GanKoya Leaman, Kassie Davis, Dustin Faeder, Shannon Romans, Carl Moore, Elizabeth Brown, Kiara Davis, Shonda Reynolds-Christian, Chelsea Wade, Caitlyn Febles and Alyssa l/n/u
Case Number: 3:2019cv00133
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed Caitlyn Febles served on 3/8/2019. (am) Modified Date on 4/10/2019 (am).
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kassie Davis, Arlene Middaugh . (Fann, Terry)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Kassie Davis, Arlene Middaugh. (Fann, Terry)
March 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Terry A. Fann. (am)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry A. Fann on behalf of Kassie Davis, Arlene Middaugh (Fann, Terry)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed Kassie Davis served on 3/15/2019. (am)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed Arlene Middaugh served on 3/16/2019. (am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Kassie Davis, Caitlyn Febles, Arlene Middaugh, Chelsea Wade. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Application is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file this case in forma pauperis. The Clerk is therefore DIRECTED to ISSUE PROCESS to defendants Chelsea Wade, Caitlyn Febles, Arlene Middaugh and Kassie Davis at the addresses provided in the complaint and to ensure service in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, including consideration of the anticipated Motion to Appoint Counsel, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/1/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/1/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tonya Christian. (am)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Brown, Kirsten Cromie, Donna Davenport, Kassie Davis, Kiara Davis, Dustin Faeder, Caitlyn Febles, GanKoya Leaman, Amani Loggins, Arlene Middaugh, Carl Moore, Shonda Reynolds-Christian, Shannon Romans, Chelsea Wade, Alyssa l/n/u, filed by Tonya Christian.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Reynolds-Christian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Cromie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Middaugh
Represented By: Terry A. Fann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amani Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GanKoya Leaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassie Davis
Represented By: Terry A. Fann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Faeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Romans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiara Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda Reynolds-Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlyn Febles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa l/n/u
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?