Bell v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Charles Jeffrey Bell
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00149
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (gb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah D. Hayes on behalf of Social Security Administration (Hayes, Jeremiah)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 2/27/19. (gb)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court, Vicki Kinkade on 3/6/19. (gb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed. Social Security Administration served on 2/25/2019. (gb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (gb).
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 2/28/19. (gb)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court, Vicki Kinkade on 2/28/19. (gb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Forwarded to USM for service) (gb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2856296) by Charles Jeffrey Bell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing PA Supreme Court, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing WDPA, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ( #2 ) is GRANTED. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/19/19. (gb)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 3/8/2019. (gb)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/8/2019. (gb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
February 15, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (gb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Jeffrey Bell. (gb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Charles Jeffrey Bell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jeffrey Bell
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?