Ajami v. Solano

Plaintiff: Pierre Salame Ajami
Defendant: Veronica Tescari Solano
Case Number: 3:2019cv00161
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Pierre Salame Ajami. (Goins, Ashley)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #5 Motion for access to minor children while case is pending and for order prohibiting removal of children. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Veronica Tescari Solano.(Gopal, Divyesh)
March 13, 2019 Respondent and Minor Passports rec'd by Clerk and placed in Civil Intake Vault this date. (af)
March 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Divyesh R. Gopal and Joe E. Hennessee. (jm)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: To address the validity of Respondent's opposition to Petitioner's unsupervised visitation based on an alleged risk of domestic abuse, the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on March 19, 2019 at 2:00pm and then rule on Petitioner's request for unsupervised visitation. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION access to minor children while case is pending and for order prohibiting removal of children filed by Veronica Tescari Solano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Venezuelan Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Proof of Petitioner's Influence, #3 Exhibit Translation of Proof of Petitioner's Influence)(Gopal, Divyesh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Divyesh R. Gopal on behalf of Veronica Tescari Solano (Gopal, Divyesh)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Notice of Need for an Interpreter (Doc. No. #9 ). The Notice requests the assistance of one of the Court's Spanish and English-speaking interpreters because neither party speaks fluent English. The Court DENIES this request. The Court does not begrudge Petitioner raising the issue and asking for a court-provided interpreter. But Petitioner must provide an interpreter himself. If Petitioner determines that he will be unable to do so by the hearing date, the Court DIRECTS Petitioner to immediately notify the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Motion for Access to Minor Children While Case is Pending and for Order Prohibiting Removal of Children (Doc. No. #5 ). A hearing is scheduled to address that motion on Friday, March 8, 2019 at 1:00pm. Petitioner shall take all steps to notify Respondent of the hearing as soon as feasible. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/4/2019. (jm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Pierre Salame Ajami of Need for an Interpreter (Goins, Ashley)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Pierre Salame Ajami of Service of Motion (Goins, Ashley)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Pierre Salame Ajami. Veronica Tescari Solano served on 2/27/2019. (Goins, Ashley)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for access to minor children while case is pending and for order prohibiting removal of children filed by Pierre Salame Ajami. (Goins, Ashley) Modified on 2/22/2019 (af).
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Veronica Tescari Solano. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
February 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca K. McKelvey and Ashley Goins. (jm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Veronica Tescari Solano (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2857361), filed by Pierre Salame Ajami. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - The Convention, #3 Exhibit B - ICARA, #4 Exhibit C - Organic Law articles in Spanshi, #5 Exhibit D - Organic Law articles in English, #6 Exhibit E - Certification of Criminal Records, #7 Exhibit F - Respondent's Passport Photo, #8 Exhibit G - I-94 Form, #9 Exhibit H - Redacted copy of EAST's Birth Certificate, #10 Exhibit I - Redacted copy of PGST's Birth Certificate, #11 Exhibit J - October 27, 2014 Order, #12 Exhibit K - June 20, 2018 Order, #13 Exhibit L - September 17, 2018 Order, #14 Exhibit M - November 16, 2018 Order, #15 Exhibit N - Photos of Petitioner with Childern, #16 Exhibit O - March 25, 2018 email, #17 Exhibit P - January 3, 2018 email, #18 Exhibit Q - Demand for Travel Authorization, #19 Exhibit R - August 3, 2018 Order, #20 Exhibit S - October 29, 2018 Letter and Death Certificate, #21 Exhibit T - Petitioner's Request for Return, #22 Exhibit U - December 19, 2018 Letter)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajami v. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Salame Ajami
Represented By: Rebecca K. McKelvey
Represented By: Ashley Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Tescari Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?