The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company v. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. and Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00166
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Dismissal of Citibank N.A. (Doc. No. #15 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice against Citibank N.A. Claims against the remaining defendant are still pending. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/9/2019. (mg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims against Citibank, N.A. (Baldwin, Brent)
March 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel Zamata Odom. (mg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Law Offices of Rachel Zamata, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC.(Odom, Rachel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC served on 2/28/2019. (Pannu, Jason)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. Citibank, N.A. served on 2/27/2019. (Baldwin, Brent)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #8 ) of M. Brendhan Flynn is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 2/26/2019. (mg)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #7 ) of Brent W. Baldwin is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 2/26/2019. (mg)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 26, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Brent W. Baldwin and M. Brendhan Flynn. (mg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney M. Brendhan Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2860586) by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Eastern District of Missouri)(Flynn, M.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Brent W. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2860566) by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Eastern District of Missouri)(Baldwin, Brent)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Citibank, N.A., and the Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
February 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jason M. Pannu. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citibank, N.A., Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2858038), filed by The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lawyer's Professional Liability Insurance Declarations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint - US District Court for the Southern District of New York, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company v. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Zamata Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bar Plan Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason M. Pannu
Represented By: Brent W. Baldwin
Represented By: M. Brendhan Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?