Clayborn v. Western Express, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jonette Clayborn
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Jonette Clayborn. Western Express, Inc. served on 3/14/2019. (Biesecker, Kyle)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED REFERRAL ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for entry of a scheduling order; for decision on all pretrial, non-dispositive motions; and for reports and recommendations on all dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/2/2019. (am)
March 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle Frederick Biesecker. (am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Western Express, Inc. (Service packets sent to Attorney by regular mail.) (am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Express, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2864545), filed by Jonette Clayborn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayborn v. Western Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonette Clayborn
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?