Tucker v. Mickiewicz et al
Plaintiff: Heather A. Tucker
Defendant: Adam Mickiewicz and Top Ten Express
Case Number: 3:2019cv00390
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Adam Mickiewicz. (Hubbard, Charles)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Adam Mickiewicz's ANSWER to Complaint by Adam Mickiewicz.(Hubbard, Charles)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Amanda L. Cocanougher: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 6/4/2019. (jm)
May 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John J. Griffin, Jr, Charles Joseph Hubbard, and Amanda L. Cocanougher. (jm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adam Mickiewicz and Top Ten Express. (jm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) Modified on 5/14/2019 (jm).
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) Modified on 5/14/2019 (jm).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adam Mickiewicz and Top Ten Express from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C551. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2911154) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Illinois Sec of State Record) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Mickiewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Mickiewicz
Represented By: Charles Joseph Hubbard
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Ten Express
Represented By: Charles Joseph Hubbard
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather A. Tucker
Represented By: Amanda L. Cocanougher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?