Caudle v. AAC Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Brown Caudle and Indiana Public Retirement System
Defendant: Andrew W. McWilliams, Kirk R. Manz, Michael T. Cartwright and AAC Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00407
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher Hamp Lyons. (mg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Within 60 days of the Court's entry of this Stipulation and Order, Lead Plaintiff will file an Amended Complaint. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint will be due 60 days after Lead Plaintiff files its Amended Complaint. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss will be due 60 days after Defendants file their motion(s) to dismiss. If Defendants move to dismiss, Defendants' reply to Lead Plaintiff's opposition will be due 30 days after Lead Plaintiff files its opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Indiana Public Retirement System. (Wood, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Hamp Lyons on behalf of Indiana Public Retirement System (Lyons, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: On July 15, 2019, Plaintiff David Brown Caudle filed a Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #23 ), and the Indiana Public Retirement System filed a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #25 ). The Indiana Public Retirement System's motion (Doc. No. #25 ) is GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. Caudle's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff (Doc. No. #23 ) is FOUND MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/13/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Notice of Unopposed Motion filed by Indiana Public Retirement System. (Martin, Jerry)
August 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood. (mg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wood on behalf of Indiana Public Retirement System (Wood, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff & Lead Counsel filed by Indiana Public Retirement System. (Martin, Jerry)
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by David Brown Caudle of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Bramlett, Paul)
July 26, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff & Lead Counsel , #25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing by David Brown Caudle re #24 Memorandum in Support, of corrected EX C-Damages Analysis-omitted in original filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-Damages Analysis)(Bramlett, Paul)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 28 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibit. The exhibit shall be REFILED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibit with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones). (mg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: On July 15, 2019, Plaintiff David Brown Caudle filed a Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #23 ), and the Indiana Public Retirement System filed a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #25 ). These motions have been referred to the Magistrate Judge to set a briefing schedule and for resolution (Doc. No. #29 ). Any responses in opposition to these motions shall be filed by July 29, 2019. Any optional replies shall be filed by August 5, 2019, and shall be limited to five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/16/2019. (mg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Pending before the Court are a Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #23 ), filed by Plaintiff David Brown Caudle, and a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. No. #25 ), filed by the Indiana Public Retirement System. These motions are referred to the Magistrate Judge to set any deadlines for responses and replies thereto and to decide. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/16/2019. (mg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 ***DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Filing by David Brown Caudle re #24 Memorandum in Support, EX C-LOSS ANALYSIS NOT FILED WITH DE#24 (Bramlett, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2019 (mg).
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jerry E. Martin in Support filed by Indiana Public Retirement System re: #25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Martin, Jerry)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF filed by Indiana Public Retirement System re #25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Martin, Jerry)
July 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Indiana Public Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Jerry)
July 15, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff & Lead Counsel filed by David Brown Caudle . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jeremy Lieberman, #2 Exhibit A-PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Certification, #4 Exhibit C-Pomerantz Resume, #5 Exhibit D-Bramlett Resume, #6 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bramlett, Paul)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION Appoint Lead Plaintiff & Lead Counsel by David Brown Caudle. (Bramlett, Paul)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The initial case management conference currently set at 10:30 a.m. on July 22, 2019 is continued and subject to be rescheduled, if necessary, after the Court's ruling on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall contact the Magistrate Judge no later than 7 days after such ruling to reset the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Jessica Perry Corley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 6/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Lisa R. Bugni to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 6/12/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Plaintiff and by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 12, 2019 GA State Bar status verified as active for Lisa R. Bugni & Jessica Perry Corley. (af)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by David Brown Caudle. All Defendants. (Bramlett, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jessica Perry Corley from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia filed by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Jessica Perry Corley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2931150) by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Lisa R. Bugni from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia filed by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Lisa R. Bugni to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2931134) by AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. (Parham, W. Travis)
June 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Travis Parham, and Michael T. Harmon. (mg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Harmon on behalf of All Defendants (Harmon, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Travis Parham on behalf of All Defendants (Parham, W. Travis)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #7 ) of Patrick V. Dahlstrom, Joseph Alexander Hood, II, Jeremy Alan Lieberman, and Jonathan David Lindenfeld are GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, CHIEF DEPUTY CLERK on 6/3/2019. (mg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney PATRICK V. DAHLSTROM, JOSEPH ALEXANDER HOOD II, JEREMY ALAN LIEBERMAN AND JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2923519) by David Brown Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Bramlett, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL J. Alexander Hood, II, Jeremy A. Lieberman, Jonathan Lindenfeld, Patrick V. Dahlstrom: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/7/2019. (mg)
May 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for J. Alexander Hood, II, Jeremy A. Lieberman, Jonathan Lindenfeld. (mg)
May 17, 2019 IL State Bar status verified as active for Patrick V. Dahlstrom. (mg)
May 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Kent Bramlett and Robert P. Bramlett. (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAC Holdings, Inc., Michael T. Cartwright, Kirk R. Manz, Andrew W. McWilliams (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2914992), filed by David Brown Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule A- Loss Chart, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudle v. AAC Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. McWilliams
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Represented By: Michael T. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk R. Manz
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Represented By: Michael T. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Cartwright
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Represented By: Michael T. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Represented By: Michael T. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown Caudle
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Jonathan Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Public Retirement System
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Christopher Hamp Lyons
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?