Younger v. Okbahhanes et al
Plaintiff: Reginald M. Younger
Defendant: M and K Logistic, LLC, Kibreab Kidane Okbahhanes and Teddy's Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00425
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REMANDING THE CASE TO STATE COURT: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (D.E. #15 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's cause of action does not exceed $75,000, and he has agreed he will not recover more than said amount, and thus, this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). This case is therefore REMANDED to the Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Defendant's Motion to Transfer (D.E. #8 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/15/19. (xc: Certified Copy of Order to Circuit Court for Davidson County by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Entry of an Order by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Martin, Sean)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Defendant's response is due on or before July 12, 2019. Any reply is due on or before July 19, 2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/3/19. (dt)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reginald M. Younger . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand, #2 Exhibit Return of Service)(Chandler, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reginald M. Younger. (Chandler, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Reginald M. Younger. (Chandler, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by M and K Logistic, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Hubert E. Hamilton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A Responsive Pleading is due on or before June 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/30/19. (dt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by M and K Logistic, LLC . (Martin, Sean)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Reginald M. Younger. (Chandler, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Hubert E. Hamilton and Patrick A. Cruise: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 6/12/2019. (dt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M and K Logistic, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
May 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sean W. Martin, Hubert E. Hamilton and Patrick A. Cruise. (gb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M and K Logistic, LLC from Circuit Court for Davidson County, case number 19C977. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2916463) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Younger v. Okbahhanes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald M. Younger
Represented By: Hubert E. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick A. Cruise
Represented By: John W. Chandler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M and K Logistic, LLC
Represented By: Sean W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kibreab Kidane Okbahhanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddy's Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?