Beard v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Helen Beard
Defendant: David Duckworth, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, William Brent Turner, Reeve B. Waud, Joey A. Jacobs, E. Perot Bissell, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Hartley R. Rogers, William M. Petrie, Wade D. Miquelon, Christopher R. Gordon and Ronald M. Fincher
Case Number: 3:2019cv00441
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: By the parties' agreement and the Court's prior order (Doc. No. #20 ), all case management deadlines in this action are deferred consistent with the Court's April 15, 2019 order in the lead case, Davydov v. Jacobs, et al., Case No. 3:19-cv-00167. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/3/19. (dt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT Statement Pursuant to Court's July 1, 2019 Order. (Cowan, Wade)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: An initial case management conference is set in this action on July 22, 2019. (Doc. No. #5 .) By July 8, 2019, the parties shall file a joint statement as to whether that conference should be deferred on the same calendar set by the Davydov orders referenced above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/1/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Milton S. McGee, III and Steven Allen Riley. (jm)
June 11, 2019 CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH 3:19-cv-167 (see Order in 3:19-cv-167 at DE 20). ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE 3:19-cv-167. (af)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself in this matter. District Judge Eli J. Richardson recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/7/19. (dt)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Frank J. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk on 6/6/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Helen Beard. (Cowan, Wade)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton S. McGee, III on behalf of All Defendants (McGee, Milton)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Frank J. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2927295) by Helen Beard. (Johnson, Frank)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: By Order entered May 31, 2019, this case has been referred to the undersigned for management of the case (Doc No. #8 .) An initial case management conference is set for Monday, July 22, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 774, U.S. Courthouse 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. The parties shall submit a proposed case management order three business days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/4/2019. (mg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Michael I. Fistel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk on 6/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern for case management as this case is related to Case No. 3:18-cv-00988 that is assigned to her. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/31/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Michael I. Fistel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2924488) by Helen Beard. (Fistel, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 176, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson, as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on July 22, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/29/2019. (jm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 01:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael I. Fistel, Jr. and Frank J. Johnson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/18/2019. (jm) Modified on 5/28/2019 (jm).
May 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Wade B. Cowan; GA State Bar status verified as active for Michael I. Fistel, Jr; CA State Bar status verified as active for Frank J. Johnson. (jm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., E. Perot Bissell, David Duckworth, Ronald M. Fincher, Christopher R. Gordon, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, Joey A. Jacobs, Wade D. Miquelon, William M. Petrie, Hartley R. Rogers, William Brent Turner, and Reeve B. Waud. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm) (jm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650- 2918930), filed by Helen Beard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Beard
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Wade B. Cowan
Represented By: Frank J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duckworth
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky B. Gregg
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Grieco
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brent Turner
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reeve B. Waud
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey A. Jacobs
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Perot Bissell
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartley R. Rogers
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Petrie
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade D. Miquelon
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Gordon
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. Fincher
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?