Borders et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Scott Borders and Melissa Borders
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00472
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Atyia on behalf of United States of America (Atyia, Dean)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America c/o US Attorney Donald Q. Cochran on 06.18.2019 by Melissa Borders. (Olson, Peter)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America c/o AG William Barr on 06.19.2019 by Melissa Borders. (Olson, Peter)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [6,7]: The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (am)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 **DISREGARD**GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Acknowledgement filed by Melissa Borders. (Olson, Peter) Modified on 6/26/2019 (am).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 **DISREGARD**GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Acknowledgement filed by Melissa Borders. (Olson, Peter) Modified on 6/26/2019 (am).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
June 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter M. Olson, Joseph T. Montgomery. (am)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to attorney Peter M. Olson by regular mail.) (am)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675055064), filed by Scott Borders, Melissa Borders. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Receipt)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borders et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Dean Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Borders
Represented By: Peter M. Olson
Represented By: Joseph T. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Borders
Represented By: Peter M. Olson
Represented By: Joseph T. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?