Branson v. China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Robert Branson
Defendant: China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00477
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd. answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/18/2019. (jw)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.. (Dietrich, Norman)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.. (Dietrich, Norman)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Michael S. Krzak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 6/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT #34675055317 in the amount of $100 posted by Robert Branson re #6 Michael S. Krzak's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Robert Branson. China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd. served on 6/18/2019. (Williams, B.)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 7 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed on 6/18/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Robert Branson. (Williams, B.) Modified on 6/25/2019 (mg).
June 20, 2019 IL State Bar status verified as active for Michael S. Krzak. (mg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Michael S. Krzak to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by Robert Branson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stocks, James) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (mg).
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael S. Krzak: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/26/2019. (mg)
June 5, 2019 IL State Bar status verified as active for Michael S. Krzak. (mg)
June 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for B. Keith Williams, and James R. Stocks. (mg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2926747), filed by Robert Branson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branson v. China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Branson
Represented By: Michael S. Krzak
Represented By: James R. Stocks
Represented By: B. Keith Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Southern Airlines Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Norman Adam Dietrich, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?