Littlefield v. Slatery et al
Plaintiff: Donald R. Littlefield
Defendant: Mark Gwyn and Herbert H. Slatery, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00490
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Donald R. Littlefield re IFP and address change. (xc: Docket sheet sent to pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Donald Littlefield re change of address and #5 IFP application. (jm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Donald R. Littlefield. (jm)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank application to proceed IFP. If Plaintiff seeks to have this Court consider his complaint, he MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the application to proceed IFP and return the properly completed application to the Court. Plaintiff's submission must be RECEIVED in this Court within 28 days of the date this Order is entered on the docket. The submission must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 3:19-cv-00490. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/17/2019. (xc:Pro se party sent this order and a blank application to proceed IFP (short form) by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 11, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donald R. Littlefield. (as)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Gwyn, Herbert H. Slatery, III, filed by Donald R. Littlefield.(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littlefield v. Slatery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Littlefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert H. Slatery, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?