Mallett-Rodgers v. Bright et al
Plaintiff: Susan Mallett-Rodgers
Defendant: Misha Bright, Joshua Bright and Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club
Interested Party: Erie Insurance
Case Number: 3:2019cv00494
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to September 25, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order no later than three days before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Susan Mallett-Rodgers. (Hardin, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Susan Mallett-Rodgers. Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club served on 6/26/2019. (Hardin, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marshall T. Cook and Richard C. Jones. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joshua Bright, Misha Bright.(Cook, Marshall)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (dt)
July 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marshall T. Cook. (dt)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall T. Cook on behalf of All Defendants (Cook, Marshall)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Susan Mallett-Rodgers. Misha Bright served on 6/20/2019. (Hardin, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Susan Mallett-Rodgers. Joshua Bright served on 6/20/2019. (Hardin, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Joshua Bright, Misha Bright, Erie Insurance and Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt)
June 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew C. Hardin. (dt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Bright, Misha Bright (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2931771), filed by Susan Mallett-Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallett-Rodgers v. Bright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misha Bright
Represented By: Richard C. Jones
Represented By: Marshall T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Bright
Represented By: Richard C. Jones
Represented By: Marshall T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mallett-Rodgers
Represented By: Matthew C. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Erie Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?