Southeastern Land Investment, LLC et al v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Southeastern Land Investment, LLC and Wilson Land Investments, LLC
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00504
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 The Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/13/19 at 10:00 AM will be held in Courtroom 776. (af)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Panther, Todd)
August 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Amy Rao Mohan. (dt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lauren Z. Curry terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/30/19. (gb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Southeastern Land Investment, LLC, Wilson Land Investments, LLC. (Mohan, Amy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Southeastern Land Investment, LLC, Wilson Land Investments, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Curry, Lauren)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. (Padgett, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. (Padgett, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wilson Land Investments, LLC. (Panther, Todd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southeastern Land Investment, LLC. (Panther, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southeastern Land Investment, LLC, Wilson Land Investments, LLC. (Panther, Todd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before July 19, 2019. Any reply is due on or before July 26, 2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/28/19. (dt) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dt).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Southeastern Land Investment, LLC, Wilson Land Investments, LLC. (Panther, Todd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. (Padgett, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth B. Padgett, Lawrence W. Kelly, Todd E. Panther and Lauren Z. Curry. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company from Circuit Court for Wilson County, Tennessee, case number 2019-CV-197. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2934067) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Land Investment, LLC et al v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Land Investment, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Z. Curry
Represented By: Todd E. Panther
Represented By: Amy Rao Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Land Investments, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Z. Curry
Represented By: Todd E. Panther
Represented By: Amy Rao Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence W. Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?