Salisbury v. Iwu
Plaintiff: Emma Salisbury
Defendant: John Iwu
Case Number: 3:2019cv00508
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John B. Iwu. (jw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by John Iwu.(Iwu, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Emma Salisbury. John Iwu served on 7/11/2019. (Parker, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to John Iwu. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
June 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Ann Parker. (jw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Iwu (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2935431), filed by Emma Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salisbury v. Iwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Salisbury
Represented By: Mary Ann Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Iwu
Represented By: John B. Iwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?