L.H., a minor, et al v. Tennessee Department of Education
Plaintiff: G.H., L.H. and D.R.
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00517
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 11), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for August 13, 2019 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following a decision on this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2019. (ds)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Tennessee Department of Education . (Mallea, Colleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Tennessee Department of Education. (Mallea, Colleen)
August 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Markham. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Markham on behalf of Tennessee Department of Education (Markham, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Tennessee Department of Education. (Mallea, Colleen)
July 23, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Colleen E. Mallea. (mg)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/18/19. (af)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Tennessee Department of Education. (Mallea, Colleen) Modified on 7/19/2019 (af).
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen E. Mallea on behalf of Tennessee Department of Education (Mallea, Colleen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by D.R., L.H., G.H.. Tennessee Department of Education served on 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Returned Receipt)(Gilbert, Justin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 1:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Tennessee Department of Education. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
June 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin S. Gilbert. (mg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee Department of Education (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2938201), filed by D.R., G.H., and L.H. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified on 6/21/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.H., a minor, et al v. Tennessee Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Education
Represented By: Michael Markham
Represented By: Colleen E. Mallea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.H.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.H.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?