Cartwright et al v. Simmons et al
Plaintiff: Jess Alan Cartwright, J. C. and Irina Cartwright
Defendant: New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC, Grant Hunter Simmons and Restoration and Recovery Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00519
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 3, 2019, to 11:00 a.m, September 26, 2019, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Jess Alan Cartwright. (Crouch, Justin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC, Grant Hunter Simmons.(Lipscomb, Owen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #12 Summons Issued to Restoration and Recovery Holdings, LLC. c/o Corporate Creations Network, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by J. C. (Crouch, Justin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Restoration and Recovery Holdings, LLC. (gb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jess Alan Cartwright. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons. Restoration and Recovery)(Crouch, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jess Alan Cartwright Notice of Service of Written Discovery by Plaintiffs (Crouch, Justin)
July 23, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Owen R. Lipscomb. (gb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC. (Lipscomb, Owen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC, Grant Hunter Simmons.(Lipscomb, Owen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen R. Lipscomb on behalf of All Defendants (Lipscomb, Owen)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/24/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC and Grant Hunter Simmons. (gb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb)
June 24, 2019 State Bar status verified as active for Justin L. Crouch. (gb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC, Grant Hunter Simmons (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2938794), filed by Jess Alan Cartwright, Irina Cartwright and J. C. Service Copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartwright et al v. Simmons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jess Alan Cartwright
Represented By: Justin L. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Justin L. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Cartwright
Represented By: Justin L. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Restoration and Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Owen R. Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Hunter Simmons
Represented By: Owen R. Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restoration and Recovery Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?