Lackey et al v. Mueller et al
Plaintiff: Stephen W. Lackey and Austin T. Pace
Defendant: ABC, DEF, Aric C. Mueller and Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00535
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Feeney, John)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 20 : The CM Order is scanned. Counsel shall re-file the document in electronic pdf format. (dt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 (DISREGARD - ATTORNEY TO REFILE) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. (Feeney, John) Modified on 8/22/2019 (dt).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/26/2019 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc..(Feeney, John)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew S. Herring terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/19. (dt)
August 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brandon E. Bass. (dt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon E. Bass on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bass, Brandon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen W. Lackey, Austin T. Pace. (Herring, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Feeney, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Christopher A. Keith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrew S. Herring to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIPT #34675055621 in the amount of $100.00 posted by Wettermark Keith LLC re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Christopher A. Keith from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama filed by Stephen W. Lackey and Austin T. Pace. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Christopher A. Keith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Stephen W. Lackey and Austin T. Pace. (dt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT #34675055541 in the amount of $100 re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Andrew S. Herring from the United States District Court for the Northern of Alabama filed by Stephen W. Lackey and Austin T. Pace. (dt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Andrew S. Herring to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Stephen W. Lackey and Austin T. Pace. (dt)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christopher A. Keith and Andrew S. Herring: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 7/22/2019. (dt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew S. Herring and Christopher A. Keith: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/19/2019. (dt) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dt).
June 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Thomas Feeney, III, Christopher A. Keith and Andrew S. Herring. (dt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEYS filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. and Aric C. Mueller. (dt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. and Aric C. Mueller from Circuit Court at Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1160. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2941882) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey et al v. Mueller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen W. Lackey
Represented By: Christopher A. Keith
Represented By: Andrew S. Herring
Represented By: Brandon E. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin T. Pace
Represented By: Christopher A. Keith
Represented By: Andrew S. Herring
Represented By: Brandon E. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric C. Mueller
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?