Webster v. Sweet Liberty, LLC
Plaintiff: Kristy Webster
Defendant: Sweet Liberty, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00556
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 11/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2020; Exhibit List due by 11/3/2020; and Witness List due by 11/3/2020. Lead counsel for each party must attend the pretrial conference. If lead counsel is not from Tennessee, local counsel must also attend. If the case settles closer to trial than two business days, the cost of summoning the jury may be assessed against the parties. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/27/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019; Discovery due by 4/18/2020; and Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2019. (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference set for August 26, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. is reset for the same day at 1:45 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/2019. (mg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Kristy Webster. (Lyle, Paige)
August 20, 2019 DISREGARD DE: 9 , FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE CORRECT DOCUMENT. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 **DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR**PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Kristy Webster. (Lyle, Paige) Modified on 8/20/2019 (am).
August 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elise Hofer McKelvey, and Rachel R. Rosenblatt. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Sweet Liberty's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Sweet Liberty, LLC.(McKelvey, Elise)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sweet Liberty, LLC. (McKelvey, Elise)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Kristy Webster. Sweet Liberty, LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Williams, Anne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter Williams, and Paige M. Lyle. (mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Sweet Liberty, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sweet Liberty, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2944109), filed by Kristy Webster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Sweet Liberty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Webster
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Anne Hunter Williams
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Liberty, LLC
Represented By: Rachel R. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Elise Hofer McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?