Dulaney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Darlene Marie Bonaparte Dulaney
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00561
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Darlene Dulaney has filed a pro se Complaint for Review of Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision. (Doc. No. #1 .) The filing fee has been paid in full. This action is REFERRED to the magistrate judge to oversee service of process on the defendants, to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 5, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Service copies picked up at intake.) (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675055447), filed by Darlene Marie Bonaparte Dulaney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Supporting Documentation, #2 Attachment Filing Fee Receipt) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dulaney v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Marie Bonaparte Dulaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?