Cornett v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Cornett
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00569
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 at 2:15 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 1:15 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/19. (gb)
August 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher W. Cardwell and Mary Taylor Gallagher. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Cardwell, Christopher)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Cardwell, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Charles Edward Sorey, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/22/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Allegations in Paragraphs 14(f) & 14(g) by David Cornett. (Hicky, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by David Cornett. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt)(Hicky, William)
July 11, 2019 MS State Bar status verified as active for Charles Edward Sorey, II. (gb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Charles Edward Sorey, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2948921) by David Cornett. (Hicky, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (gb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 02:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
July 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William B. Hicky. (gb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2947069), filed by David Cornett. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornett v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Cardwell
Represented By: Mary Taylor Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cornett
Represented By: William B. Hicky
Represented By: Charles Edward Sorey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?