Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. v. Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC
Plaintiff: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00576
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC. (Douglass, Scott)
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Lauren Refinetti Timmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott McLean Douglass. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC. (Douglass, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC . (Douglass, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC. (Douglass, Scott)
August 1, 2019 TX State Bar status verified as active for Lauren Refinetti Timmons. (mg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Lauren Refinetti Timmons from the United States District Court for the Northern of Texas filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Lauren Refinetti Timmons filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re: #18 MOTION for attorney Lauren Refinetti Timmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2962620). (Polly, Erin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Lauren Refinetti Timmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2962620) by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Holly Hawkins Saporito to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 16, 2019 GA State Bar status verified as active for Holly Hawkins Saporito. (mg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Robert L. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Holly Hawkins Saporito filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re: #13 MOTION for attorney Holly Hawkins Saporito to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2952093). (Polly, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Holly Hawkins Saporito from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Holly Hawkins Saporito to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2952093) by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Robert L. Lee filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re: #10 MOTION for attorney Robert L. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2952074). (Polly, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Robert L. Lee from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Robert L. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2952074) by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Polly, Erin)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/10/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (mg)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert L. Lee: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/31/2019. (mg)
July 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Erin Palmer Polly, and GA State Bar status verified as active for Robert L. Lee. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. (mg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2948689), filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Registration, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. v. Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Historic Hotels of Nashville, LLC
Represented By: Scott McLean Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Lee
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Lauren Refinetti Timmons
Represented By: Holly Hawkins Saporito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?